This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/02/2021 at 02:41:19 (UTC).

Yun et al. v. Song et al.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Yun filed an Other lawsuit against Song. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stern, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4201

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stern, Michael

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Sok Hun Yun

Sun Yung Ahn

Defendants and Respondents

Bae Guen Song

Los Angeles, CA 90019

Eon Escrow Inc.

Deborah Koh

Christopher Weston

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Western Law Connection Corp.

B&B Investment Properties LLC

Propent Real Estate Inc.

Chris Hong Wong

Jamie Park

Sang Ur

NMSI Inc.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Waecker

Attorney at Law Office Of Mark Waecker

633 W. Fifth St. 28Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gopal Somabhai Patel

Attorney at Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

310 Golden Shore Pkwy 4Fl

Long Beach, CA 90801-5511

Christopher G. Weston

Attorney at Western Law Connection Corp.

4311 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 615

Los Angeles, CA 90010

David Charles Bolstad

Attorney at Safarian, Choi & Bolstad, LLP

555 S. Flower St., Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher Alan Johnson

Attorney at Safarian Choi & Bolstad

555 South Flower St. Suite 650

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Yong Bom Lee

Attorney at Lee & Associates

3530 Wilshire Blvd #1280

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Alex Myung Cha

Attorney at Law Offices of Alex Cha & Associates

707 Wilshire Blvd., 46Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 52 days: 11/18/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 52 days: 11/18/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 52 days: 11/18/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed to:. Due on 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 01/20/2022 By 52 Day(s) [As to Respondents Chris Hong Yong; Jamie Park; Audrey Jung; Propent Real Estate, Inc. dba B&B Investment Properties; Eon Escrow, Inc.; Deborah Koh, Sang Ur, and NMSI, Inc.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: (Vol 1 of 1) Sok Hun Yun, Plaintiff and Appellant Mark Waecker, Retained counsel Sun Yung Ahn, Plaintiff and Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sok Hun Yun Attorney: Mark Waecker Plaintiff and Appellant: Sun Yung Ahn Attorney: Mark Waecker

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 30, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Mark Waecker dated 8/24/2021 in response to Court's August 19, 2021 notice; and addendum to previously filed Case Information Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Sok Hun Yun

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Sun Yung Ahn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The civil case information statement filed on August 16, 2021 for the appeal filed on July 26, 2021 is deficient as it does not have attached to it a copy of the signed judgment of dismissal. (Code Civ. Proc., 581d; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).) You must provide the Court with a conformed copy of the signed judgment of dismissal, with a proof of service attached (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.25(a)(1)-(2)), within 15 days of the date of this notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sok Hun Yun Attorney: Mark Waecker Plaintiff and Appellant: Sun Yung Ahn Attorney: Mark Waecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sok Hun YunAttorney: Mark Waecker Plaintiff and Appellant: Sun Yung AhnAttorney: Mark Waecker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed July 26, 2021 by Sok Hun Yun and Sun Yung Ahn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV09255; Trial Court Judge: Stern, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN LAW CONNECTION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where NMSI INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EON ESCROW INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Alan Johnson