This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 16:03:57 (UTC).

Yuba County Water Agency v. State Water Resources Control Board et al.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2022 Yuba County Water Agency filed an Other lawsuit against State Water Resources Control Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kapetan, Kristi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4832

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kapetan, Kristi

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yuba County Water Agency

Appellants and Defendants

State Water Resources Control Board

Eileen Sobeck

E. Joaquin Esquivel

Dorene D'Adamo

Nichole Morgan

Sean Maguire

Laurel Firestone

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan Short Bezerra

Attorney at Bartkiewicz Kronick et al

1011 22Nd St #100

Sacramento, CA 95816-4907

Jennifer Thompson Buckman

Attorney at Bartkiewicz, Kronick & Shanahan

1011 22Nd St

Sacramento, CA 95816-4907

Holly Jeanne Jacobson

Attorney at Bartkiewicz, Kronick & Shanaan

1011 22Nd St

Sacramento, CA 95816-4907

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Adam Leonard Levitan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 03/24/2023 By 60 Day(s) 2nd Request (Per Order filed 1/23/23)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellants have filed a stipulation to extend time for the filing of appellants' opening brief and appendix until after the motion for attorneys' fees is ruled upon and consolidated into this appeal. This case is a CEQA case entitled to priority. The motion is denied. Appellant is granted a 60-day extension of time to file appellants' opening brief and appendix. Appellant may file a motion for consolidation after the notice of appeal is filed in the case involving fees.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 05/15/2023 By 112 Day(s) 2nd Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 01/23/2023 By 47 Day(s) (1st Stip/Request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Appendix and AOB due w/in 70 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: 9/26/22; Fresno Superior Court; Cert of Mailing of Register of Actions per CRC 8.124(a)(2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: 9/26/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the case has not been selected for this court's mediation program (Local Rules, rule 2(c)). Suspension of record preparation pursuant to local rule 2 is lifted and California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124 and 8.216, are reinstated as of the date of this letter; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Deputy AG Levitan obo Applts

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Deputy AG Levitan obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Bezerra obo Resp

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Applt; State Water Resources Control Board

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 8/24/22; Deputy AG Levitan obo State Water Resources Control Board; 8/4/22 judgment after court trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 20CECG03342; Trial Court Judge: Kapetan, Kristi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less