This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/08/2023 at 12:01:47 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. T.S.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2023 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against T S. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8011

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant

Z. S.

Defendant

T. S.

Not Yet Classified

A. M.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Richard Thomas Swanson

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/02/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 11/27/2023 By 61 Day(s) Appellant granted extension to 11/27/2023 to file the appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: Modified address of:; Notes: Appellant per request for extension of time filed 09/26/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 11/27/2023 By 61 Day(s) Appellant requesting extension to 11/27/2023 to file the appellant's opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: Appellant's copy of letter dated 8/18/23. Envelope marked, "Return to sender, unable to forward." Placed in file.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 5 vols. electronic CT (1408 pp.); 47 vols. electronic RT (1931 pp.); 1 vol. (15a) supplemental electronic RT of 06/21/2021 afternoon session (48 pp.) Sealed portion of RT: Confidential hearing dated 01/06/2022 (pages 766-786) Confidential hearing dated 03/14/2022 (pages 1537-1554.) Appellant's opening brief due: 9/27/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: Central California Appellate Program dated 6/29/23 returning the Clerk's Transcript to Yolo County Superior Court for corrections.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Yolo County Superior Court. The electronic Clerk's Transcript has been rejected for not being paginated pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.74(a)(2), (c)(5). The corrected Clerk's Transcript is due by 7/18/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Vanessa Murphy granted extension to 5/5/23. LAST EXTENSION. Rule 8.409(d)(2) letter sent. Response due: 5/15/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Vanessa Murphy requesting extension to 5/6/23. Completed 0 hours of 5-10 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/14/23. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV202093; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less