This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/18/2023 at 17:03:18 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. T.R., Jr.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against T R , Jr. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7364

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Not Yet Classified, Defendants and Appellants

T. R.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Janette F. Cochran

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hannah Johl

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The appeal filed on November 15, 2022, is dismissed pursuant to In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835. Robie, Acting P.J., Renner, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: T. R. Attorney: Janette F. Cochran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketBrief: Phoenix H. brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: T. R.Attorney: Janette F. Cochran

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, AOB due 2/14/23, RB due 30 days thereafter. Any minor's brief due 10 days after RB. ARB due 20 days after RB.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 Vol. paper CT (513 pgs), 1 Vol. paper RT (250 pgs). Appellant's Opening Brief is due February 14, 2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Janette Cochran appointed for appellant T.R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: for appellant T.R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR, Michelle Muller, granted extension to 1/9/23.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR, Michelle Muller, requesting extension to 2/6/22. Completed 0 hours of 16 total hours.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to rule 8.416, record to be received by 12/8/22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 11/15/22. Termination of parental rights.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2020184; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less