This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/07/2022 at 19:01:50 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. R.C.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against R C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5781

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

R. C.

Not Yet Classified

V. C.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Anna Jo Curry

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The court examined the notice of appeal and determined that the order appealed from is nonappealable. Therefore, the appeal filed on February 28, 2022, is dismissed. (Welf. & Inst. Code, 395; In re Tracy Z. (1987) 195 Cal.App.3d 107, 112.) RAYE, P.J., MAURO, J., KRAUSE, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 02/28/2022. Juvenile dependency.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20210187; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less