This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/28/2023 at 17:00:47 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. K.M.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against K M. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6902

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

K. M.

Not Yet Classified

I. M.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Jennifer K. Magee

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Ashley M. Mooney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

03/03/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant has been notified pursuant to rule 8.412(d)(1) of the California Rules of Court and has not filed the appellant's opening brief or requested the appointment of counsel. Therefore, the appeal filed on September 2, 2022, is dismissed. ROBIE, Acting P.J. (Renner, J.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due 12/12/22.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/30/2022

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 Vol. paper CT ( 283 pgs), 2 Vols paper RT ( 345 pgs). Sealed portion of RT: (pgs. 211 - 216) Sealed Confidential Hearing, dated 7/19/22. Appellant's Opening Brief is due November 9, 2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 9/2/22. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2022552; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2002551; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less