This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/30/2023 at 07:01:33 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. D.R.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against D R. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7369

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

D. R.

Not Yet Classified

M. R.

N. R.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer Lynn Cretcher-McCoy

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Hannah Johl

Darlene A. Kelly

Natalie Danielle Moore

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. R. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. R.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency Attorney: Saba Ahmed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Yolo County Health and Human Services AgencyAttorney: Saba Ahmed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: D. R. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: D. R.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: 1 vol. electronic CT (16 pp.); Declaration of O. Weisenberg dated 5/8/23 stating that after an in-depth search, the Father's Form ICWA-020 and Form ICWA-030 were not able to be located. Appellant's opening brief due: 7/24/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023

DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 Vols. paper CT (317 pgs), 2 Vols. paper RT (319 pgs). Appellant's Opening Brief is due February 22, 2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/29/2022

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Darlene Kelly appointed for Appellant M.R.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Filed C.C.A.P. recommendation for counsel.; Notes: For Appellant M.R.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Reporter's Notice filed 12/15/22. Reporter's Transcript for notice of appeal filed 12/15/22 is due by 1/4/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 12/08/2022. (Minor M.R.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2022

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle Muller granted extension to 1/9/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2022

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle Muller requesting extension to 1/9/23. Completed 0 hours of 10 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 11/4/22 by D.R. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20221201; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV20221202; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

[+] Read More [-] Read Less