This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/13/2023 at 16:03:30 (UTC).

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. C.P. et al.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against C P. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Maguire, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7469

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Maguire, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

Appellants and Defendants

C. P.

V. P.

Not Yet Classified

H. P.

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Kaquishka Waverly Turner

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Patricia K. Saucier

John Benjamin Ekenes

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Natalie Danielle Moore

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

05/18/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Yolo County Superior Court. The electronic Augmented Clerk's Transcript is rejected for lack of electronic bookmarks pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.74(a)(3), (c)(5). The clerk of this court and counsel are directed to delete the previously received transcript. The corrected Augmented Clerk's Transcript is due by 6/7/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that supplemental record has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: 1 vol. electronic CT (43 pp.); 1 vol. electronic RT (114 pp.) Briefing time remains suspended.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Briefing remains suspended. Augmented record due: 5/1/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2023

DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: By Appellant V.P. Briefing time remains suspended.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/2023

DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: From Appellant V.P. joining in Appellant C.P.'s record omission letter.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: From Appellant C.P. dated 2/18/23. Briefing time suspended.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/07/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 2/6/23 by C.P. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: John Benjamin Ekenes old email: bekenes@appellate-law.com new email: ben.ekenes@gmail.com

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney John Benjamin Ekenes appointed for Appellant V.P. Appellant's opening brief remains due 2/22/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: For appellant V.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Appellants' opening briefs due: 2/22/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 3 vols. CT (637 pgs.); 2 vols. RT (422 pgs.) Appellants' opening briefs due: 2/22/23

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Patricia K. Saucier appointed for Appellant C.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: For appellant C.P.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/08/2022

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle L. Brann granted extension to 1/3/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/07/2022

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Michelle L. Brann requesting extension to 1/3/23. Completed 0 hours of 4 total hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 11/30/22 by appellant V.P. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 11/22/22 by appellant C.P. Juvenile dependency.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: JV2022109; Trial Court Judge: Maguire, Daniel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less