This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/29/2021 at 02:13:40 (UTC).

Yee et al. v. Zhang et al.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Yee filed an Other lawsuit against Zhang. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3203

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Qi Mou Yee

Yim Fong Wong

Appellants and Defendants

Xiao Hua Huang

San Francisco, CA 94122

Zhuo Zhang

San Francisco, CA 94122

Bank of America, N.A.

Xiao Hua Kuang

San Francisco, CA 94122

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie Anne Foster

Attorney at Steven Adair MacDonald & Partners P.C.

870 Market St Ste 500

San Francisco, CA 94102-3012

Steven Macdonald

Attorney at Steven Adair MacDonald & Associates, PC

870 Market Street Suite 500

San Francisco, CA 94102

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Matthew Edward Podmenik

Attorney at McCarthy & Holthus, LLP

1770 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final On August 9, 2021, the Clerk of this Court notified appellant Xiao Hua Kuang of default in failure to either pay the filing fee or apply for a waiver. On September 7, 2021, the Clerk further informed appellant Kuang of default in failing to file a case information statement. The deadline to cure both defaults was September 22, 2021. Cross-appellant Zhuo Zhang was also notified on August 31, 2021 of failure to either pay the filing fee or apply for a waiver. The deadline to remedy this default was September 20, 2021. These defaults have not been cured, and the time to do so has expired. The appeal filed by Xiao Hua Kuang and the cross-appeal of Zhuo Zhang are therefore dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Dismissal order sent via U.S. Mail to pro per parties Xiao Hua Kuang and Zhuo Zhang

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Notes: On August 9, 2021, the Clerk of this Court notified appellant Xiao Hua Kuang of default in failure to either pay the filing fee or apply for a waiver. On September 7, 2021, the Clerk further informed appellant Kuang of default in failing to file a case information statement. The deadline to cure both defaults was September 22, 2021. Cross-appellant Zhuo Zhang was also notified on August 31, 2021 of failure to either pay the filing fee or apply for a waiver. The deadline to remedy this default was September 20, 2021. These defaults have not been cured, and the time to do so has expired. The appeal filed by Xiao Hua Kuang and the cross-appeal of Zhuo Zhang are therefore dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Proposed dismissal order re appeal and cross-appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: As to appellant Xiao Hua Kuang; notice sent via U.S. Mail with blank civil case information form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: **Cross-Appeal** Filed 07/30/2021 by Defendant Zhuo Zhang in propria persona appealing judgment from 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 07/12/2021 by Defendant Xiao Hua Kuang in propria persona appealing judgment from 05/20/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC19579633

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Podmenik, Matthew