This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/12/2021 at 10:53:15 (UTC).

YEAGER v. THOMAS

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 YEAGER filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against THOMAS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8974

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Victoria Yeager

Grass Valley, CA 95945

Respondents and Defendants

Thomas & Associates

Michael Thomas

Other

Charles E. Yeager

Penn Valley, CA 95946

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Appellant and Other Attorney

Jon Robert Williams

Attorney at Williams Iagmin LLP

2475 Kettner Boulevard

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Natalie Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street, Suite 2800

Sacramento, CA 95814

Robert M. Shaughnessy

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

501 West Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

Natalie P. Vance

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street, Suite 2800

Sacramento, CA 95814

Robert Martin Shaughnessy

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

501 W. Broadway, Suite 600

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Michael Thomas Attorney: Robert M. Shaughnessy Defendant and Respondent: Thomas & Associates Attorney: Robert M. Shaughnessy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: one jacket

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Victoria Yeager Attorney: Jon Robert Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C085795; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201400169683CUPNGDS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMAS & ASSOCIATES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon R. Williams