Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/12/2021 at 18:02:57 (UTC).

Yang v. Simas et al.

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Yang filed an Other lawsuit against Simas. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Krueger, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3348

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Third Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Krueger, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Bin Yang

Beverly Hills, CA 90213

Defendant and Respondent

Steven L. Simas et al.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Barry Zoller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Kenneth C. Feldman

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 West 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Raul Luis Martinez

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 03/19/21. Designating additional CT and RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 03/08/21. Designating CT and settled statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: MAURO, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Raul L. Martinez, counsel for respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondents' mediation statement due 02/08/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: By appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Request to Waive Court Fees, Mediation Statement, and Civil Case Information Statement rejected at filer's request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Filing fee or fee waiver application due: 1/29/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Civil Appeal Mediation Statement due: 1/29/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 1/7/21. Professional negligence.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 34201900264048CUPNGDS; Trial Court Judge: Krueger, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTINEZ RAUL L. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZOLLER BARRY