This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/11/2021 at 12:19:31 (UTC).

Yanez v. Vasquez

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Yanez filed an Other lawsuit against Vasquez. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1804

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Aenlle-Rocha, Fernando

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Carlos Yanez

Respondents and Defendants

Omar Vasquez

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Appellate Division of the Los Angeles Superior Court

Stanley Mosk Courthouse 111 N. Hill St.,

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Andrei V. Serpik

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

140 S Lake Ave Ste 372

Pasadena, CA 91101

Michael Dale Anderson

Attorney at Anderson & Associates

The Commons 140 S. Lake Avenue, # 372

Pasadena, CA 91101-4789

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Samuel Berlin

Attorney at Alston & Bird

333 S Hope St Fl 16

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1410

Kaimipono David Wenger

Attorney at Inner City Law Center

624 S Grand Ave Ste 2510

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3329

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: One volume (BV033326, 19STUD09747).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: THE COURT: On April 22, 2021, we received from the clerk of the appellate division a copy of the opinion it filed in this matter on that date. The copy bore the notation: "This opinion has been certified for publication in the Official Reports. It is being sent to assist the Court of Appeal in deciding whether to order the case transferred to the court on the court's own motion under rules 8.1000-8.1018." We decline to order the matter transferred to this court because we find that transfer is not necessary to secure uniformity of decision or to settle an important question of law. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1002.) Panel: Lavin, Acting P.J., Egerton, J., and Thomas J.* * Judge of the Los Angeles Superior Court, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Order modifying opinion and denying certification for transfer Filed dated May 19, 2021 In The Appellate Division of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: One volume (BV033326, 19STUD09747).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certification from appellate division filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kaimipono David Wenger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Berlin, Gregory S