This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2023 at 08:09:35 (UTC).

Yanez v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Yanez filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crowley, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4390

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crowley, Daniel

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Xadrian Yanez

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Daniel Crowley

Interested Parties

Children's Hospital Los Angeles

USC Care Medical Group, Inc.

Vaughn Starnes, M.D.

Richard Wookyum Kim, M.D.

Jaye Alexander Weston, M.D.

Laura Ann Hastings, M.D.

Janet Zhu, D.O.

Lillian Lai, M.D.

Eugenia Ho, M.D.

Paul Porter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

David Michael Medby

Attorney at Garcia, Artigliere & Medby

One World Trade Center - Suite 1950

Long Beach, CA 90831

Stephen M. Garcia

Attorney at Garcia & Artigliere

One World Trade Center Suite 1950

Long Beach, CA 90831

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 312 N. Sprint St., Dept. 28

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Heidi Lynn Smith

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews & Kjar

1230 Rosecrans Avenue Suite 450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Raymond Leslie Blessey

Attorney at Reback, McAndrews & Blessey, LLP

1230 Rosecrans Ave. - #450

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Dr

San Marino, CA 91108

Zena Jacobsen

Attorney at Cole Pedroza, LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Alexander McLean Watson

Attorney at Fraser Watson Croutch

100 W Broadway #650

Glendale, CA 91210

Daniel K. Dik

Attorney at Fraser Watson & Croutch, LLP

100 West Broadway Suite 650

Glendale, CA 91210-1201

Stephen Clark Fraser

Attorney at Fraser Watson & Croutch, LLP

100 West Broadway Suite 650

Glendale, CA 91210-1201

Cherie Lynn Lieurance

Attorney at Fraser Watson & Croutch LLP

100 W Broadway, Ste 650

Glendale, CA 91210

John Barrow Sprangers

Attorney at Horvitz & Levy LLP

3601 W Olive Ave, Fl 8

Burbank, CA 91505

Kelly Lynn Kiseskey

Attorney at Law Offices of David J. Weiss

11340 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Attorneys for real party in interest informing case has been settled in its entirety.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by USC Care Medical Group, Inc., Vaughn Starnes, Richard Wookyum Kim, and Paul Porter, to petition for writ of mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by Children's Hospital Los Angeles, to petition for writ of mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Defendant and Real Party In Interest CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES hereby associating the law firm of COLE PEDROZA LLP as counsel of record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by petitioner, to real parties' applications for extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: David Axelrad and John Sprangers for real parties in interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Civil Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where USC CARE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIEURANCE CHERIE L.