This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/02/2023 at 01:04:21 (UTC).

Yaghobyan v. Romero

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Yaghobyan filed an Other lawsuit against Romero. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keosian, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2738

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keosian, Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Hasmik Yaghobyan

Respondent and Defendant

Alan Romero

Pasadena, CA 91101-2672

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Reshma Kamath

700 El Camino Real Suite 120, #180

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Alan James Romero

Attorney at Romero Law, APC

80 S. Lake Avenue, Suite 880

Pasadena, CA 91101-2672

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Appellant's amended proof of service re reply brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Reshma Kamath, for Appellant, requests to appear remotely for oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Alan Romero, for Respondent, requests to appear remotely for oral argument, but agrees waive if no other party requests oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hasmik Yaghobyan Attorney: Reshma Kamath One extension granted for a total of 89 days: 10/31/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 01/30/2023 By 89 Day(s) 11/02/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 01/30/2023 By 89 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hasmik YaghobyanAttorney: Reshma Kamath; Notes: One extension granted for a total of 89 days: 10/31/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 01/30/2023 By 89 Day(s) 11/02/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 01/30/2023 By 89 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Application for extension of time to file Appellant's reply brief is granted to January 30, 2023. Edmon, P. J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Alan Romero Attorney: Alan James Romero Two extensions granted for a total of 119 days: 05/27/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 08/10/2022 By 58 Day(s) 05/31/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 08/10/2022 By 58 Day(s) 08/01/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 12/08/2022 By 120 Day(s) 08/02/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/10/2022 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion to consolidate appeals B312738 and B312740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).; Notes: Respondents' Motion to Dismiss the Appeals B312738 and B312740

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's letter submitted on June 17, 2021 via truefiling has been rejected. If counsel wishes to move the court, you may do so pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.54.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's submitted filing via truefiling has been rejected. The Notice of Designating the Record must be filed with the Superior Court (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.121(a)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: [Appeal Apr 5, 2021: Hasmik Yaghobyan]Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card; Hasmik Yaghobyan, Plaintiff and Appellant David Ryan Griffin, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hasmik Yaghobyan Attorney: Reshma Kamath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Hasmik YaghobyanAttorney: Reshma Kamath

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: [Appeal Apr 5, 2021: Hasmik Yaghobyan]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Apr 5, 2021 by Hasmik Yaghobyan (filed by private counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC704116; Trial Court Judge: Keosian, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less