This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/02/2021 at 00:33:17 (UTC).

Xian v. Sengupta et al.

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Xian filed an Other lawsuit against Sengupta. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fineman, Nancy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2175

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fineman, Nancy

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Benny Xian

Respondents and Defendants

BeyondCore, Inc.

Salesforce.com

Arijit Sengupta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Gerard Flanagan

Attorney at Debt Enforcement Law Group

32932 Pacific Coast Hwy #14-384

Dana Point, CA 92629

James M. Hanlon, Jr

Attorney at Glynn, Finley, Mortl, Hanlon & Friedenberg, LLP

One Walnut Creek Center 100 Pringle Ave #500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Keith Edward Eggleton

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Jesse L. Miller

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street - Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jennifer Rose Fearnow

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 2Nd Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

David Jason de Jesus

Attorney at Reed Smith

101 Second Street - Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: *** Further extensions are not contemplated ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 12/08/2021 By 30 Day(s) *** Further extensions are not contemplated ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 12/08/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 11/08/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 11/08/2021 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: David J. de Jesus is associated in as counsel for respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: POS of Opening Brief on Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Benny Xian Attorney: James M. Hanlon, Jr Missing POS on Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 12/08/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Arijit SenguptaAttorney: Jesse L. Miller; Notes: *** Further extensions are not contemplated ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Benny XianAttorney: James M. Hanlon, Jr; Notes: Missing POS on Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 03/15/2021. Designating CT with RT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 1434, Benny Xian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Benny Xian Attorney: Michael Gerard Flanagan Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Petitioner Submitted the Certificate of Interested Parties and the Civil Case Information Statement via TrueFiling in the case initiation queue, which is incorrect. It is rejected with instructions to file the documents in this pre-existing case, instead.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Benny XianAttorney: Michael Gerard Flanagan; Notes: Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 03/05/2021 by Counsel for Plaintiff Benny Xian appealing judgment from 01/05/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 19CIV05937; Trial Court Judge: Fineman, Nancy

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Salesforce.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hanlon, James M. Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLANAGAN MICHAEL GERARD