This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/07/2021 at 17:08:42 (UTC).

WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Seigle, Laura. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3507

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Seigle, Laura

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WORLD INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, LLC

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Laura A. Seigle

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA, LLC

Dave Buckalew

Andrew McGinnis

MB HOLDINGS, INC

Mark Wood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Gary S. Pancer

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelson & Dicker LLP

555 S. Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Daniel Joseph Taylor

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

555 S Flower St Ste 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2407

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Farrow

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave. 10Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Kelly McMahon Hagemann

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave., 10Th Fl

Irvine, CA 92614

Samantha Alice Gavin

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave 10Fl

Irvine, CA 92614

Marisol Corral Mork

Attorney at Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP

555 S. Flower St., Fl 31

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have received and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on July 9, 2021, the preliminary opposition filed on July 15, 2021, and the reply and motion for judicial notice filed on July 20, 2021. The motion for judicial notice is granted as to exhibits 1 and 2. Petitioner does not establish entitlement to extraordinary relief or error by the respondent court. (See, e.g., Evid. Code 912, subd. (a); see also State Compensation Ins. Fund v. WPS, Inc. (1999) 70 Cal.App.4th 644, 654, 656-657. We also draw counsel's attention to Rule 4.4 of the Rules of Professional Conduct.) Accordingly, the petition is denied. Grimes-Wiley-Ohta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: World Insurance Associates, LLC request for judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: World Insurance Associates, LLC Reply in support of writ petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Attorneys for Real Parties in Interest Acrisure of California, LLC, Dave Buckalew, Andrew McGinnis, and M.B. Holdings, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 2 of 2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where World Insurance Associates LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ACRISURE OF CALIFORNIA LLC DBA BOB GABRIEL CO. INSURANCE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Alice Gavin