This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 05:03:01 (UTC).

Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, et al. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy 0799/REO702

Case Summary

On 05/20/2021 Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, filed an Other lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy 0799/REO702. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2870

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Murphy, Daniel

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Woodbridge Liquidation Trust

Woodbridge Mortgage Investment Fund 1, LLC

Woodbridge Wind-Down Entity, LLC

WB Honoapiilani, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London Subscribing to Policy 0799/REO702

Not Yet Classified

Bus. & Prof. Code, 17209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel N. Klevens

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Tracy M. Lewis

Richard E. Zelonka, Jr.

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Consumer Law Section

 

Court Documents

B312870

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Respondents are to recover their costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final The judgment is affirmed. Respondents are to recover their costs on appeal.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Egerton, Anne Harwood; Participants: Edmon, Lee Smalley (Concur) Lavin, Luis A. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. Respondents are to recover their costs on appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Submission vacated and cause resubmitted.; Notes: THE COURT: Due to the number and complexity of the issues in this case, the submission of November 21, 2022, in the above-entitled matter is vacated. The matter will stand resubmitted as of the date on which this order is filed. Panel: EGERTON, J., EDMON, P. J. and LAVIN, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: [Cause argued and submitted. See order issued 02/07/2023]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Richard Zelonka, for Respondent (20 minutes)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joel Klevens, for Appellants (20 minutes)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: November 21, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: RBF +30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Pro Hac Vice Attorneys

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of change of handling attorney. Tracy M Lewis is the handling attorney for respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Woodbridge Liquidation Trust Attorney: Joel N. Klevens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Woodbridge Liquidation TrustAttorney: Joel N. Klevens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appeal filing fee: check# 393341 for $775.00 (L.A. Depositions, Inc.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: appellants' notice filed in trial court on 6/1/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 5/20/2021 by Woodbridge Liquidation Trust, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV39191; Trial Court Judge: Murphy, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less