This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/30/2023 at 23:57:18 (UTC).

TIMOTHY W. v. JULIE W. et al.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 TIMOTHY W filed an Other lawsuit against JULIE W. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9837

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lewis, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Timothy J. Woodall

Respondents and Defendants

Julie A. Woodall

Ronnie Dean Echavarria Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas S. Honig

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas S. Hoing

501 Civic Center Dr West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

John Stewart Clifford

Attorney at Smith LC

4 Park Plaza Suite 1050

Irvine, CA 92614

German Ariel Marcucci

Attorney at Ropers Majeski, PC

445 S Figueroa St Ste 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Terry Paul Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers Majeski

445 South Figueroa St Ste 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

G059837

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: check status of appeal in SC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Ext. by Supreme Court re: petition for hearing filed:; Notes: The time for granting or denying reviewing he above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including March 1, 2023, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Ronnie Dean Echavarria's response to petition for review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying rehearing petition filed.; Notes: The petition for rehearing is DENIED. MOORE, ACTING P. J. WE CONCUR: GOETHALS, J. SANCHEZ, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final Affirmed Moore/Goethals/Sanchez; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Moore, Eileen C.; Participants: Goethals, Thomas M. (Concur) Sanchez, Maurice (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) Affirmed Moore/Goethals/Sanchez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Merits. Cause called. Douglas Honig argued for appellant. John Clifford argued for Julie W., respondent and German Marcucci argued for Ronnie Dean Echavarria Sr., respondent. Cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.140(b)(1), the appeals filed on January 20, 2021, and January 21, 2021, are DISMISSED for appellant's failure to timely file a proof of service for the designation of the record. Appellant is advised that this dismissal will become final as to this court 30 days after the date of this order, at which time this court will lose the power to vacate, reconsider or modify it. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.264(b)(1).) A motion to vacate dismissal requires a showing of good cause. To allow the court sufficient time to review and evaluate the showing of good cause, a motion to vacate dismissal should be filed well before the 30-day jurisdictional deadline.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Notice of failure to comply w/notice of default re: POS for designation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: 2ND APPEAL$775 Paid. Forthcoming from superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: By aplt as to 1st appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: 2nd appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 2ND APPEAL Aplt Timothy J. Woodall

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: Timothy J. Woodall

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01101730; Trial Court Judge: Lewis, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOANG DOUGLAS