This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/21/2021 at 14:07:39 (UTC).

Woodall v. Woodall et al.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Woodall filed an Other lawsuit against Woodall. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9429

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lewis, Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Timothy Woodall

Julie A Woodall

Respondents and Defendants

Ronnie Dean Echavarria Sr.,

Julie A Woodall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Douglas S. Honig

Attorney at Law Office of Douglas S. Hoing

501 Civic Center Dr West

Santa Ana, CA 92701

John Stewart Clifford

Attorney at Smith LC

4 Park Plaza Suite 1050

Irvine, CA 92614

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

John Stewart Clifford

Attorney at Smith LC

4 Park Plaza Suite 1050

Irvine, CA 92614

German Ariel Marcucci

Attorney at Ropers Majeski, PC

445 S Figueroa St Ste 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

German Ariel Marcucci

Attorney at Ropers Majeski, PC

445 S Figueroa St Ste 3000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Misc. fee received for:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: combined respondent's brief and opening brief of the cross-appealOne extension granted for a total of 30 days: 07/19/2021 Stipulation of extension of time filed:. Due on 08/18/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 10/29/2021 By 22 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 10/29/2021 By 22 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: On August 12, 2021, appellant Timothy Woodall filed a motion to consolidate this appeal, case No. G059429, with case No. G059837. This appeal pertains to an order granting anti-SLAPP motions. The related appeal concerns the award of attorney fees and costs six months after the orders granting the anti-SLAPP motions. The motion to consolidate these two appeals is DENIED. Appellant's opening brief and appendix in case No. G059429 have already been filed (on June 18, 2021, after numerous extensions). Respondents' briefs, which for Julie A. Woodall includes issues raised by a cross-appeal, are currently due on September 17, 2021. In case No. G059837, appellant's opening brief and appendix are past due and a default notice issued on August 26, 2021. The opening brief and appendix were originally due on April 15, 2021, and multiple extensions were provided. Based on these circumstances, it appears that consolidating the two appeals may result in additional delay rather than facilitating the prompt and efficient adjudication of the appeals. If the briefing in both appeals is completed at approximately the same time, these related matters will be assigned to the same panel and oral argument, if requested, will occur on the same date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Appellant's motion to consolidate case with G059837.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 09/17/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 09/17/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant Julie A. Woodall is in default for failure to file a Civil Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g) in a timely manner. The appeal may be dismissed or monetary sanctions may be imposed unless, within 15 days of the date of this notice, the Civil Case Information Statement is filed with this court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Paid in superior court. 2ND APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Paid at superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Cross-appeal Appellant Julie Woodall Notice of appeal filed 10/06/2020. Judgment date 07/27/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: aplt Timothy Woodall Resp Julie A Woodall 1st Appeal Resp Ronnie Dean Echavarria Sr., dba Allegiant PI 2ND APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Per request of appellant - CCIS returned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS is RDN must list Appellant and Plaintiff on Part 3 "Party and Attorney Info."

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: aplt Timothy Woodall Resp Ronnie Dean Echavarria Sr., dba Allegiant PI 2ND APPEAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: aplt Timothy WoodallResp Julie A Woodall 1st Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Central; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2019-01101730; Trial Court Judge: Lewis, Gregory

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUCCI GERMAN A. ESQ.