This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/16/2022 at 10:37:53 (UTC).

Wood v. Handelin

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Wood filed an Other lawsuit against Handelin. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kennedy, Daryl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4372

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kennedy, Daryl

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Andrea Wood

Defendants, Respondents and Not Yet Classified

James Handelin

Joanne Marie Magdaleno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

James E. Reed

Attorney at Nichols, Catterton, Downing & Reed

3433 Golden Gate Way, Suite C

Lafayette, CA 94549

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Paul C. Meidus

Attorney at Reese, Smalley, Wiseman & Schweitzer, LLP

P.O. Box 994647

Redding, CA 96099

Paul C Meidus

P.O. Box 994647

Redding, CA 96099

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Brief due: 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service; Notes: Amended proof of service for appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andrea Wood Attorney: James E. Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 05/20/2022; Party Attorney: Objector and Respondent: James HandelinAttorney: Paul C. Meidus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Andrea WoodAttorney: James E. Reed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: appellant's counsel advising that the opening brief has been rejected because it does not comply with the California Rules of Court. Corrected brief due: 3/28/22. (See letter for details)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief submitted on 3/10/22. Rejected because it does not comply with the California Rules of Court. Corrected brief due by 3/28/22. See letter dated 3/16/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due: 3/14/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due: 2/8/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 7/29/2021; Designating additional documents for CT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's Civil Case Information Statement has been rejected as a copy of the order or judgment has not been attached. Correct and re-submit by 8/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.; Notes: Respondent's mediation statement due: 8/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 7/22/2021; Designating CT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: and Appellant's Mediation Statement due: 8/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant. Receipt #R324990.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant's filing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: and Appellant's Mediation Statement due: 7/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 7/1/2021. Fraud, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Shasta County Superior Court - Main; County: Shasta; Trial Court Case Number: 30146; Trial Court Judge: Kennedy, Daryl

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEIDUS, PAUL C