This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/30/2023 at 13:05:39 (UTC).

WONG v. RESTORATION ROBOTICS

Case Summary

On 06/07/2022 WONG filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against RESTORATION ROBOTICS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4929

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Sunny C. Wong

Defendant and Respondent

Restoration Robotics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Andrew Scott Love

Chase M. Stern

Mark C Molumphy

James Ian Jaconette

Frank James Johnson

Thomas C. Goldstein

Tyson C. Redenbarger

Noorjahan Rahman

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Melissa Arbus Sherry

Daniel Robert Gherardi

Nicholas Rosellini

Matthew Rawlinson

Gavin M. Masuda

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The applications to appear as counsel pro hac vice are granted. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40(a).) The petition for review is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Appellant requests Thomas C. Goldstein of the law firm of Goldstein & Russell, PC, to appear as counsel pro hac vice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sunny C. Wong Attorney: Thomas C. Goldstein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application to appear as counsel pro hac vice (pre-grant); Notes: Respondent asks for an order permitting Melissa Arbus Sherry, Latham & Watkins LLP, to appear as counsel pro hac vice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Restoration Robotics, Inc. Attorney: Nicholas Rosellini

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sunny C. Wong Attorney: Thomas C. Goldstein

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A161489; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); Trial Court Case Number: 18CIV02609

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less