This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/30/2023 at 04:00:49 (UTC).

Winstead et al. v. Placer Foreclosure, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Winstead filed an Other lawsuit against Placer Foreclosure, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Freccero, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4602

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Freccero, Stephen

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Charles Winstead

Elisabeth Winstead

Respondent and Defendant

Placer Foreclosure, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Elliot L. Bien

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

John G Downing

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/15/2022

DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final filed in superior court on 4/6/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2022

DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.; Notes: Notice of Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Partial The application for leave to file a reply is granted. The request for temporary stay and petition for writ of supersedeas are denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to Petition for Writ of Supersedeas (w/bookmarks)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Supersedeas or Injunctive Stay Order (see 3/17/22 order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The application for leave to file a reply is granted. The request for temporary stay and petition for writ of supersedeas are denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Supersedeas and Exhibits Volumes 1, 2, and 3

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check No. 1770

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
03/14/2022

DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to Petition for Writ of Supersedeas (no bookmarks or service on trial court)(filed w/permission)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: responsive filing fee paid via TrueFiling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2022

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to petition for writ of supersedeas showing service on trial judge/superior court

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellants Charles & Elisabeth Winstead substitutes Elliot L. Bien as counsel of record in place of themselves.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Charles Winstead Attorney: Elliot L. Bien Plaintiff and Appellant: Elisabeth Winstead Elliot Bien, attorney for appellants, w/copy of judgment and order attached; No. C on page 1 re bankruptcy or stay checked - copy of order staying enforcement of the judgment attached

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: or Stay Order Temporary Stay Requested Pending Consideration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2022

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Charles WinsteadAttorney: Elliot L. Bien Plaintiff and Appellant: Elisabeth Winstead; Notes: Elliot Bien, attorney for appellants, w/copy of judgment and order attached; No. C on page 1 re bankruptcy or stay checked - copy of order staying enforcement of the judgment attached

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022

DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/28/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 02/22/2022 by Plaintiffs Charles and Elisabeth Winstead in propria persona appealing judgment from 01/12/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Marin County Superior Court; County: Marin; Trial Court Case Number: CIV1901599; Trial Court Judge: Freccero, Stephen

[+] Read More [-] Read Less