This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/28/2022 at 21:10:36 (UTC).

WINICK v. NOBLE LA EVENTS (PROSIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE)

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 WINICK filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against NOBLE LA EVENTS PROSIGHT SPECIALTY INSURANCE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3374

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Stephen Winick

Respondents and Defendants

Noble LA Events, Inc.

Noble Worldwide Inc.

John McKillop

Dick Clark Productions, Inc.

Thomas Applewhite

Prosight Specialty Insurance

Respondent and Intervenor

Prosight Specialty Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Kian Tamaddoni

Attorney at Benedon & Serlin, LLP

22708 Mariano Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6128

Samuel Ogbogu

Attorney at Samuel Ogbogu, Inc.

4311 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 308

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Judith E. Posner

Attorney at Benedon & Serlin, LLP

22708 Mariano Street

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6128

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Frederic Tree Tanner

Attorney at Nelson & Griffin LLP

800 West 6Th Street, Suite 788

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Bryan Shant Aghakhani

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

6100 Center Drive, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045-9213

Joshua D. Bordin-Wosk

Attorney at Bordin Semmer LLP

6100 Center Drive,Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Yury Galperin

Attorney at Lieber & Galperin LLP

1801 Century Park East, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Patrice J. Hensley

Attorney at LIEBER & GALPERIN, LLP

1801 Century Park East, 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent requesting certification of interested parties/entities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review granted; briefing deferred; Notes: The petition for review is granted. Further action in this matter is deferred pending the consideration and disposition of TriCoast Builders v. Fonnegra, S273368 (see Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.512(d)(2)), or pending further order of the court. Submission of additional briefing, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.520, is deferred pending further order of the court. Votes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., Corrigan, Liu, Kruger, Groban, Jenkins and Guerrero, JJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephen Winick Attorney: Kian Tamaddoni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Noble LA Events, Inc. Attorney: Frederic Tree Tanner Defendant and Respondent: Noble Worldwide Inc. Attorney: Frederic Tree Tanner Defendant and Respondent: John McKillop Attorney: Frederic Tree Tanner **Filed with Permission**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Timely answer to petition for review missing bookmarks. Counsel was asked to resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Dick Clark Productions, Inc. Attorney: Joshua D. Bordin-Wosk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Three doghouses (volumes 1 to 3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stephen Winick Attorney: Kian Tamaddoni

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B305697; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC569126

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DICK CLARK PRODUCTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ProSight Specialty Insurance Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHAKHANI BRYAN SHANT