This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/30/2022 at 14:01:56 (UTC).

Windom v. Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 Windom filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Campins, Julia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5169

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Campins, Julia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Eric Windom

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa

Interested Party

The People

Others

Trent Allen

Keyshawn McGee

Terryonn Pugh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Evan Isaac Kuluk

Attorney at Contra Costa Alternate Defender Office

627 Ferry Street

Martinez, CA 94553

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office Of The District Attorney

900 Ward Street

Martinez, CA 94553

Other Attorneys

Roberta Brooks

1092 First Avenue

Napa, CA 94558

Anthony G. Ashe

1975 Willow Pass Road

Bay Point, CA 94565

Carmela Anne Caramagno

P.O. Box 1811

Lafayette, CA 94549

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioner (Cal. Supreme Court Case No. S275077)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and/or prohibition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: 1. Office of the District Attorney, Contra Costa County Via e-service through TrueFiling to appellate.pleadings@contracostada.org 2. Office of the Attorney General, State of California Via e-service through TrueFiling to sfagdocketing@doj.ca.gov 3. Roberta Brooks, Counsel for codefendant Trent Allen Via e-service through TrueFiling to robertabrooks@sprintmail.com 4. Anthony Ashe, Counsel for codefendant Keyshawn McGee Via e-service through TrueFiling to anthony.ashe@icloud.com 5. Carmela Caramagno, Counsel for codefendant Terryonn Pugh Via e-service through TrueFiling to caramagnolaw@comcast.net 6. Judge Campins, Contra Costa County Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits A - J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate and/or Prohibition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: 11976380; Trial Court Judge: Campins, Julia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Contra Costa is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony G. Ashe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmela Anne Caramagno