This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/27/2021 at 03:31:30 (UTC).

WILMOT v. CONTRA COSTA COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION (STATE OF CALIFORNIA)

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 WILMOT filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CONTRA COSTA COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7670

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Jon Wilmot

Respondents and Defendants

Board of Retirement of The Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association

Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association

Intervenor

State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Timothy Keith Talbot

Attorney at Rains Lucia Stern St.Phalle & Silver, PC

2300 Contra Costa Boulevard, Suite 500

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Zachery A. Lopes

Attorney at Rains Lucia Stern St.Phalle & Silver, PC

2300 Contra Costa Boulevard, Suite 500

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

May-tak Chin

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Harvey Lewis Leiderman

Attorney at Reed Smith

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

Intervenor Attorney

Anthony P. O'Brien

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 "I" Street - Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jon Wilmot Attorney: Timothy Keith Talbot Petitioner's Reply to Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association's and Board of Retirements Answer to Petition for Review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Intervener: State of California Attorney: Anthony P. O'Brien **2nd Answer to Petition**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association Attorney: May-tak Chin Defendant and Respondent: Board of Retirement of The Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association Attorney: May-tak Chin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jon Wilmot Attorney: Timothy Keith Talbot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A152100; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: MSN161730

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COMMUNITY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE OF CALIFORNA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Paul O'Brien