This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/23/2021 at 19:38:17 (UTC).

Williams v. The Superior Court of Tulare County

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Tulare County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3086

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Georgia Williams

Respondent

The Superior Court of Tulare County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mary Elizabeth Moss

Attorney at Tulare County Public Defender

221 S Mooney Blvd Rm G-35

Visalia, CA 93291

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The "Petition for Writ of Mandate," filed on July 22, 2021, is denied. Levy, A.P.J. * Before Levy, A.P.J., Detjen, J. and Meehan, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate by pub def Mary E Moss/Georgia Williams from May 26, 2021 order denying petitioners return of property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: writ info sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Tulare County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant