This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/31/2023 at 01:00:32 (UTC).

Williams v. Superior Court Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Scheper, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4585

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Scheper, Barbara

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wilbur Williams

Respondent

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Carol Lucas

Buchalter APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nick A. Alden

Respondent Attorneys

Court Counsel

Hon. Barbara Scheper

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael Barrett Fisher

Jack R. Scharringhausen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on November 21, 2022 has been read and considered. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All counsel: The following matter is being transferred between divisions pursuant to California Rule of Court 10.1000(b)(1)(A). From Division Two to Division Seven: B324585, Williams v. Superior Court Los Angeles County Division Seven had related appeals Williams et al. v. Petrosian Esthetic Enterprise, LLC et al., (B305926) and Williams et al. v. Petrosian et al., (B307439) and related original proceedings Williams et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al., (B307856) Williams et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al., (B309822) and Williams, Jr. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al., (B313666). In the interest of uniformity of decision and judicial economy, the matter is transferred to Division Seven.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Proposed Oder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Vol 3 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petitoin for Writ of Mandate - Vol 2 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate - Vol 1 of 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less