This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/30/2023 at 04:56:47 (UTC).

Williams v. Jefferson

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against Jefferson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kleifield, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4758

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kleifield, Steven

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Stacie Williams

Respondents and Defendants

Cedars Sinai Medical Center

Heather Vucetin

Petar Vucetin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Harold Charles Klaskin

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Anita Jain

 

Court Documents

B314758

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Feuer, Gail Ruderman; Participants: Perluss, Dennis M. Segal, John

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: The order denying Stacie's special motion to strike under section 425.16 and awarding the Vucetin parties their attorneys' fees is affirmed. The Vucetin parties are to recover their costs on appeal. (Signed Unpublished)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Respondents

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: July 7, 2022 at 1:30 p.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellant's letter re unavailability for oral argument on August 5, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 19, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stacie Williams Attorney: Harold Charles Klaskin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stacie WilliamsAttorney: Harold Charles Klaskin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Harold Klaskin.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on August 4, 2021 by Stacie Williams

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV30308; Trial Court Judge: Kleifield, Steven

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less