This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/08/2021 at 14:08:40 (UTC).

Williams v. Jefferson

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against Jefferson. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kleifield, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4758

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kleifield, Steven

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Stacie Williams

Respondents and Defendants

Jenero Jefferson

Cedars Sinai Medical Center

Heather Vucetin

Petar Vucetin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Harold Charles Klaskin

12021 Wilshire Blvd #510

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Randi Lavonne Cooper

Attorney at Law Office of Randi L Cooper

5777 W. Century Blvd. Ste 750

Los Angeles, CA 90045-5671

Anita Jain

Attorney at Meylan Davitt Jain & Arevian, LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1850

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ari Lorin Markow

Attorney at Spile, Leff & Goor LLP

16501 Ventura Blvd. Suite 610

Encino, CA 91436-2072

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stacie Williams Attorney: Harold Charles Klaskin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Stacie WilliamsAttorney: Harold Charles Klaskin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Harold Klaskin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on August 4, 2021 by Stacie Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV30308; Trial Court Judge: Kleifield, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDARS-SINAI MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARKOW ARI L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOPER RANDI L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAIN ANITA