This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/07/2022 at 03:35:58 (UTC).

Williams v. J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Williams filed an Other lawsuit against J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Roesch, Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3492

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Roesch, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Cornelius Williams

Defendant and Appellant

J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

David L. Amell

Attorney at Maune, Raichle, Hartley, French & Mudd, LLC

1900 Powell Street, Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

Marissa Christina Langhoff

Attorney at Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd, LLPC

1900 Powell Street Suite 200

Emeryville, CA 94608

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Carrie Lin

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg (MG+M)

201 Spear Street Floor 18

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christopher O. Massenburg

Attorney at Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP

14 Wall Street, 28Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Nadia Ann Sarkis

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd. 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: Counsel's joint motion to consolidate appeal case numbers A162561 and A163492, is granted. The above-entitled appeals are ordered consolidated for purposes of the record on appeal, briefing, oral argument, if any, and decision. All future filings shall bear both case numbers and case captions. Appellant's consolidated opening brief shall be due 40 days from the filing of the record on appeal in case number A163492.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Joint Motion to Consolidate Appeals A162561 and A163492 (to court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Note:; Notes: when record on appeal is filed set consolidated AOB in this case and A162561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. Attorney: Nadia Ann Sarkis Nadia A. Sarkis, attorney for Appellant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: The law firm of Manning Gross + Massenburg LLP, attorneys of record for J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., hereby associates the law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-counsel for the purpose of representing Appellant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.Attorney: Nadia Ann Sarkis; Notes: Nadia A. Sarkis, attorney for Appellant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 09/15/2021 by Counsel for Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. appealing orders from 08/16/2021 and 09/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19032329; Trial Court Judge: Roesch, Frank

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J-M MANUFACTURING COMPANY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Owen Massenburg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nadia Ann Sarkis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIN CARRIE