This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 01:22:52 (UTC).

Wiederhorn v. Wiederhorn

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 Wiederhorn filed an Other lawsuit against Wiederhorn. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3631

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Tiffany A. Wiederhorn

Defendant and Respondent

Andrew A. Wiederhorn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Edward McLean Lyman, III

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Mark Schaeffer

Gerald M. Serlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Ruling on motion.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (after record).; Notes: Respondent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 06/26/2023 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL (RT) VOLUME 1 OF 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX VOL. 1 OF 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tiffany A. Wiederhorn Attorney: Edward McLean Lyman, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The Court having found good cause exists hereby grants Appellant leave to file her opening brief within five (5) days of this order. Stratton, P.J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 06/26/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Andrew A. WiederhornAttorney: Gerald M. Serlin Attorney: Mark Schaeffer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tiffany A. WiederhornAttorney: Edward McLean Lyman, III

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Benedon & Serlin, LLP substitute in as attorney of record for respondent Andrew A. Wiederhorn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court finding good cause hereby grants appellant's application to reinstate the case. Appellant's counsel is ordered to file a case information statement and pay the outstanding filing fee within five (5) days of this order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed September 26, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant ( September 26, 2022 by Tiffany A. Wiederhorn. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's $775 filing fee paid by The Cochran Law Firm.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 26, 2022 by Tiffany A. Wiederhorn.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BD600290

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less