This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/31/2023 at 12:05:32 (UTC).

Widen v. City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Widen filed an Other lawsuit against City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7010

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Eric Widen

Divisdero Street HOA

David Lang

Appellant

2856-62 Washing Street HOA

Defendant

City and County of San Francisco

Respondents and Not Yet Classified

Divisadero Place Homeowners Association

Kate Kardos

Stone Melet

Nicole Melet

Steven Polevoi

Eidelman Family Trust

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alison M. Crane

Mark William Allen

Steven Edward McDonald

Appellant Attorneys

Andrew J. Wiegel

G. Ryan Patrick

Defendant Attorneys

Dennis J. Herrera

Brian F. Crossman

James Moxon Emery

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Emily Lowther Brough

Andrew M. Zacks

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/22/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 08/22/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/23/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 06/23/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 02/06/2023. Designating CT with RT(attached).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4(e-filed), R-1(e-filed)(attached to designation) **Entire Record Electronic**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Transmittal sheet from SF Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: clerk's notice to counsel re appellant's notice designating record on appeal; dated 2.23.23;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: 2856-62 Washing Street HOA Attorney: G. Ryan Patrick (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 08/22/2023; Party Attorney: Appellant: 2856-62 Washing Street HOAAttorney: Andrew J. Wiegel Attorney: G. Ryan Patrick

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: 2856-62 Washing Street HOAAttorney: G. Ryan Patrick; Notes: (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 01/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: From: Wiegel Law Group Check number: 6278 Date issued: 1/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/12/2023 by Counsel for Appellant 2856-62 Washington Street HOA appealing judgment from 01/10/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF15514665

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less