This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/24/2020 at 22:41:03 (UTC).

Widen et al. v. The City and County of San Francisco et al.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2018 Widen filed an Other lawsuit against The City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5075

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Appellants

David Lang

Eric Widen

Rebecca Widen

Gwen Lang

Appellants and Intervenors

Denis Harper

Zsuzsanna Saper

David Lang

Eric Widen

Rebecca Widen

Gwen Lang

Respondents

San Francisco Department of Building Inspection

San Francisco Abatement Appeals Board

The City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Divisadero Place Homeowners Association

Steven Polevoi

Stone Melet

Kate Kardos

Nicole Melet

Eidelman Family Trust, Kardos, Kate

Not Yet Classified

Rita I. Harper Trust

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Alison M. Crane

Mark William Allen

Appellant and Intervenor Attorneys

Michael E. Fox

Mark David Byrne

Alison M. Crane

Mark William Allen

Respondent Attorney

Brian F. Crossman

Interested Party Attorney

Andrew M. Zacks

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Eric Widen Attorney: Alison M. Crane Petitioner and Appellant: Rebecca Widen Petitioner and Appellant: Gwen Lang Petitioner and Appellant: David Lang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Eric WidenAttorney: Alison M. Crane Petitioner and Appellant: Rebecca Widen Petitioner and Appellant: Gwen Lang Petitioner and Appellant: David Lang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 05/11/2020 By 56 Day(s) arb stip; 3/16/2020 to 5/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Eidelman Family Trust, Kardos, Kate Attorney: Andrew M. Zacks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Eidelman Family Trust, Kardos, KateAttorney: Andrew M. Zacks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: The City and County of San Francisco Attorney: Brian F. Crossman **due 30 days after aob in A155078 has been filed**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: The City and County of San FranciscoAttorney: Brian F. Crossman; Notes: **due 30 days after aob in A155078 has been filed**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: The City and County of San Francisco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: The City and County of San Francisco

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Intervener and Appellant: Denis Harper Attorney: Michael E. Fox (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Intervener and Appellant: Denis HarperAttorney: Michael E. Fox; Notes: (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Eric Widen Attorney: Mark William Allen (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Eric WidenAttorney: Mark William Allen; Notes: (order attached)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 07/29/18 designating 8.124 WITHOUT a record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: filed 06/29/18 by Michael E. Fox as counsel for Intervenor Denis Harper and Zsuzsanna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF15514665

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less