This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/03/2022 at 11:25:49 (UTC).

White v. A360 Media, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 White filed an Other lawsuit against A360 Media, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fruin, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3731

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fruin, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Angela White

Respondents and Defendants

A360 Media, LLC.

EHM Productions, Inc.

Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.

Warner Media, LLC.

A360 Media, LLC

Warner Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Lynne Marie Ciani

Attorney at The Ciani Law Firm

6303 Owensmouth Ave, 10Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6272

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert S. Gutierrez

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3274

Kelli L. Sager

Attorney at Davis Wright & Tremaine

865 S. Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: +60 days via 1-10-22 stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: +60 days via 1-10-22 stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela White Attorney: Lynne Marie Ciani ** 2 volumes of appendix **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 08/31/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: EHM Productions, Inc.Attorney: Kelli L. Sager Defendant and Respondent: Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc.Attorney: Kelli L. Sager Defendant and Respondent: Warner Media, LLCAttorney: Kelli L. Sager; Notes: +60 days via 1-10-22 stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 08/31/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: A360 Media, LLCAttorney: Robert S. Gutierrez; Notes: +60 days via 1-10-22 stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela WhiteAttorney: Lynne Marie Ciani; Notes: ** 2 volumes of appendix **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated July 26, 2021 - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# D4018401 for $775 - (R)(InfoTrack US, Inc)(Appeal filed on July 15, 2021: Angela White - (R))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela White Attorney: Lynne Marie Ciani June 30, 2021: Angela White - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela White Attorney: Lynne Marie Ciani July 15, 2021: Angela White - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela WhiteAttorney: Lynne Marie Ciani; Notes: June 30, 2021: Angela White - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela WhiteAttorney: Lynne Marie Ciani; Notes: July 15, 2021: Angela White - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check# D4018374 for $775 - (U)(InfoTrack US, Inc)(Appeal filed June 30, 2021: Angela White - (U))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: June 30, 2021: Angela White - (U)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: July 15, 2021: Angela White - (R)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV49927; Trial Court Judge: Fruin, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A360 MEDIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER MEDIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EHM PRODUCTIONS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WARNER BROS. ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant