This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/02/2021 at 01:03:47 (UTC).

Whisenton v. Porter

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Whisenton filed an Other lawsuit against Porter. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3192

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant

Mildred Whisenton

Respondent

Roger Peter Porter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Michele Antoinette Dobson

Attorney at Law Offices of Michele A Dobson,

3711 Long Beach Blvd. Ste 5047

Long Beach, CA 90807-3319

Respondent Attorney

Hugh R. Burns

Attorney at Sinclitico & Burns

111 West Ocean Blvd. Suite 2400

Long Beach, CA 90802

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Mildred Whisenton Attorney: Michele Antoinette Dobson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice vacated.; Notes: The default notice issued earlier this date pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(2) is hereby vacated as having been issued in error.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (Mildred Whisenton) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement that has attached to it the appealable order or judgment, pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g). If a Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days from the date of this notice, the court may impose sanctions, including dismissal on the grounds of non-compliance with rule 8.100(g)(2), and failure to establish that this court has jurisdiction over the case.[VACATED LATER THIS DATE.]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 15, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on July 8, 2021 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Mildred WhisentonAttorney: Michele Antoinette Dobson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: civil filing fee paid via credit card; Mildred Whisenton, Appellant Michele Antoinette Dobson, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 05/11/2021 by Mildred Whisenton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19LBCV00460

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS HUGH R. ESQ.