This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/24/2023 at 09:02:15 (UTC).

Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1 v. All Persons Interested Etc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Westlands Water District Distribution District No 1 filed an Other lawsuit against All Persons Interested Etc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaab, Kimberly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4294

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gaab, Kimberly

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1

Respondents and Defendants

All Persons Interested Etc. et al.

AquAlliance

California Water Impact Network

Planning and Conservation League

California Sportfishing Protection Alliance

Institute for Fisheries Resources

North Coast Rivers Alliance

Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's Associations

San Francisco Crab Boat Owners Assocation

Winnermem Wintu Tribe

Central Delta Water Agency

South Delta Water Agency

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jon-David Rubin

Attorney at Westlands Water District

Po Box 6056

Fresno, CA 93703

William Thomas Chisum

Attorney at Kronick Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard et al

400 Capital Mall, 27Th Floor

Sacramento, CA 95814

Allison Elizabeth Burns

Attorney at Stradling Yocca et al

660 Newport Center Dr #1600

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Daniel J. O'Hanlon

Attorney at Kronick Moskovitz, Tiedemann & Girard et al

1331 Garden Highway, 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95833

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Adam F. Keats

Attorney at Law Office of Adam Keats

303 Sacramento St, 2Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Roger Brannon Moore

Attorney at Law Office of Roger B. Moore

337 17Th St Ste 211

Oakland, CA 94612-3356

Stephanie Lynn Clarke

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEPHAN C. VOLKER

1633 University Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94703

Alexis Elizabeth Krieg

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephan C. Volker

1633 University Ave

Berkeley, CA 94703-1424

Jamey M Volker

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephan Volker

1633 University Ave

Berkeley, CA 94703-1424

Stephan C. Volker

Attorney at Law Offices of Stephan C. Volker

1633 University Avenue

Berkeley, CA 94703

Stephen Dean Ruiz

Attorney at Mohan, Harris, Ruiz & Rubino LLP

3439 Brookside Rd Ste 208

Stockton, CA 95219-1768

Dante John Nomellini

Attorney at NOMELLINI, GRILLI & McDANIEL

235 East Weber Avenue P.O. Box 1461

Stockton, CA 95201

Dante John Nomellini, Jr

Attorney at Nomellini Grilli & McDaniel

Po Box 1461

Stockton, CA 95201

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 02/03/2023 By 0 Day 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 02/03/2023 By 58 Day(s) 1st

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 02/03/2023 By 58 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred.; Notes: Appellant's "MOTION FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ...," filed on November 7, 2022, is deferred pending consideration of the appeal on its merits. Respondent's brief remains due for filing on or before December 7, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Request for Judicial Notice filed 11/7/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: by Atty Burns obo Applt - 1) AOB 2) Motion for Judicial Notice 3) Notice of Lodging Appellants Appendix via Flash Drive

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: atty Burns obo Applt - requesting judicial notice of the December 9, 2020, letter from Christopher J. Beardsley, for the Bureau of Reclamation of the United States Department of the Interior, (the "Bureau of Reclamation Letter") - holding 15 days for possible opposition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1 Attorney: Allison Elizabeth Burns Atty Burns obo Applt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: 16V/4672 pagesdocument is too large to attach to ACCMS and can be located in the G drive > Teams > Court Document Repository > 32. Oversized Documents - too large for ACCMS folder.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 02/03/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: California Sportfishing Protection AllianceAttorney: Stephan C. Volker Defendant and Respondent: Institute for Fisheries ResourcesAttorney: Stephan C. Volker Defendant and Respondent: North Coast Rivers AllianceAttorney: Stephan C. Volker Defendant and Respondent: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermen's AssociationsAttorney: Stephan C. Volker Defendant and Respondent: San Francisco Crab Boat Owners AssocationAttorney: Stephan C. Volker Defendant and Respondent: Winnermem Wintu TribeAttorney: Stephan C. Volker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Ruiz obo Respondent Central Delta Water Agency and South Delta Water Agency

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Atty Allison Burns obo Applt Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: It has come to this court's attention that we have not received the following: [X] The Civil Information Statement as required by rule 8.100(g) of California Rules of Court has not been filed. If a perfected Case Information Statement is not filed within 15 days of the date of this notice, the court may impose monetary sanctions or dismiss the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Volker obo Respondent California Sportfishing Protection Alliance et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Moore obo Respondent California Water Impact Network, AquAlliance, Planning and Conservation League

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Allison Burns obo Applt Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days; Civil Case Information statement remains due 15 days after the superior court sends notification.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Allison Burns obo Applt Westlands Water District Distribution District No. 1 appeals from order entered 11/5/2021 denying motion for validation of judgment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Fresno County Superior Court - Main; County: Fresno; Trial Court Case Number: 20CECG01011; Trial Court Judge: Gaab, Kimberly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where All Persons Interested Etc. et al. is a litigant

Latest cases where San Francisco Crab Boat Owners Association is a litigant

Latest cases where AquAlliance is a litigant