This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/17/2022 at 13:55:00 (UTC).

WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE v. WEST AMERICAN ROOFING (ENRIGHT)

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 WESTLAKE VILLAGE MARKETPLACE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against WEST AMERICAN ROOFING ENRIGHT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9019

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Westlake Village Marketplace, LLC

Appellants and Defendants

West American Roofing, Inc.

Victor Enright

Appellant and Interested Party

Victor Enright

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Martin Peter Eramo

34192 Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 6

Dana Point, CA 92629

Appellant, Defendant and Interested Party Attorney

Darren Michael Richie

Attorney at Richie Litigation

206 W 4Th Street, Suite 330

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4670

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 file jacket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Westlake Village Marketplace, LLC Attorney: Martin Peter Eramo

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: 1 Jacket.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: West American Roofing, Inc. Attorney: Darren Michael Richie Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Victor Enright Attorney: Darren Michael Richie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: West American Roofing, Inc. Attorney: Darren Michael Richie Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Victor Enright Attorney: Darren Michael Richie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B306358; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: LC105475

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Westlake Village Marketplace, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where West American Roofing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHIE DARREN M.