This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/18/2023 at 02:14:18 (UTC).

Weil v. The Superior Court of Fresno County

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 Weil filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Fresno County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Arax, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2809

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Arax, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Derenny Z. Weil

Respondent

The Superior Court of Fresno County

Interested Party

Leonard O. Root

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Giulio A. Sanchez

Amanda Glenn Hebesha

John Patrick Kinsey

Interested Party Attorney

Mark Elliott Chielpegian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The "Petition for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief," filed on May 24, 2021, is denied without prejudice. "[A] remainder beneficiary has standing under Probate Code section 17200, subdivision (b)(7) to petition the probate court for an order compelling a trustee to account." (Esslinger v. Cummins (2006) 144 Cal.App.4th 517, 520.) "[I]nformation or a particular account under [Probate Code] section 16061, sought by petition under [Probate Code] section 17200, subdivision (b)(7), lies within the probate court's discretion." (Id. at p. 526.) Petitioner has not shown the probate court abused its discretion in deferring ruling on the petition to compel accounting until trial. Should the probate court deny the petition to compel accounting at trial, petitioner may again seek writ relief from the ruling with this court. Levy, A.P.J. * Before Levy, A.P.J., Franson, J. and DeSantos, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RPI's Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and Other Appropriate Relief submitted by Atty Chielpegian filed 6/1/21.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One Volume 323 pgs.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate by atty Amanda G Hebesha/Derenny Z. Weil re: order denying petition for accounting

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Writ info sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 by petitioner via True Filing Order ID 141184772892

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less