This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/03/2021 at 09:02:39 (UTC).

WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION v. LENDLEASE (US) CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LENDLEASE US CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6855

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

Webcor Construction, LP

Webcor Construction, L.P.

Defendants and Appellants

Oceanwide Plaza, LLC

Lendease (US) Construction, Inc.

Lendlease (US) Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

William T. Eliopoulos

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP.

Five Palo Alto Square 3000 Camino Real, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Carrie Anne Macintosh

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker, LLP

5 Palo Alto Square 3000 El Camino Real, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Heather Nicole Herd

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker LLP

3000 El Camino Real Building 5, Suite 200

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Matthew Peng

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-3367

Don Willenburg

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

1111 Broadway, Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

S. Mitchell Kaplan

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

275 Battery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

Philip J. Blanchard

Attorney at Rutan & Tucker LLP

611 Anton Boulevard, #1400

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1998

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

John A. Foust

Attorney at Ralls Gruber & Niece LLP

1700 South El Camino Real, Suite 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Daniel A. Cantor

Attorney at Oceanwide Plaza LLC

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2584

Anthony James Barron

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

1 Embarcadero Center, Floor 18

San Francisco, CA 94111-3716

Dylan J. Crosby

Attorney at Wagner Jones Helsley PC

1700 South El Camino Real, Suite 150

San Mateo, CA 94402

Ken Wah Choi

Attorney at Oceanwide Plaza LLC

865 South Figueroa Street, Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2584

John D. Hanover

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP.

333 South Hope Street, 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Joseph S Sestay

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street, 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Webcor Construction, L.P. Attorney: Don Willenburg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One box.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Oceanwide Plaza, LLC Attorney: John A. Foust **FILED WITH PERMISSION**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Electronically timely petition for review missing the Court of Appeal decision. Counsel was asked to resubmit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B299310; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV03357

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OCEANWIDE PLAZA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where LENDLEASE (US)CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where WEBCOR CONSTRUCTION LP DBA WEBCOR BUILDERS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie Anne Macintosh