This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/23/2021 at 10:16:49 (UTC).

Wayshak v. Weiland

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Wayshak filed an Other lawsuit against Weiland. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Zepeda, Carrie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8557

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Zepeda, Carrie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Jonathan Wayshak

Appellant and Defendant

Caroline Alida Weiland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Elizabeth Manassau

Attorney at MANASSAU LAW OFFICES, PC

Po Box 720321

San Jose, CA 95172--321

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michael Sean Devereux

9171 Wilshire Blvd Ste 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • HearingDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement missing judgment or order appealing from.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee received from:; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Caroline Weiland, filed 10/14/20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: DV000950; Trial Court Judge: Zepeda, Carrie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less