This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/13/2023 at 09:09:09 (UTC).

Watson v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Watson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Magno, Teresa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8869

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Magno, Teresa

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Denzel Watson

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Elizabeth Megan Lashley-Haynes

Attorney at Los Angeles Co Public Defender

300 East Walnut

Pasadena, CA 91101

Albert J. Menaster

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender's Office

320 West Temple Street Suite 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Ricardo Daniel Garcia

Attorney at Los Angeles County Public Defender

320 West Temple Street Ste 590

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Jennell R Mimms

Attorney at Los Angeles Co Public Defender

210 W Temple St 19Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Respondent Attorney

Hon. Teresa P. Magno

Compton Courthouse 200 West Compton Blvd., Dept. F

Compton, CA 90220

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petition for review is denied. [S275397]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate filed on March 7, 2022, has been read and considered, along with the letter filed on June 9, 2022. The petition is denied because petitioner fails to demonstrate a prima facie case entitling him to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on March 7, 2022, has been read and considered, along with the letter filed on June 9, 2022. The petition is denied because petitioner fails to demonstrate a prima facie case entitling him to extraordinary relief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Los Angeles County Public Defender dated June 9, 2022 re: The purpose of this letter is to alert this court to the decision of another Court of Appeal last month that supports petitioner's position in this matter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less