This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/24/2022 at 20:45:11 (UTC).

WATSON v. LONG BEACH CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION (CITY OF LONG BEACH)

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 WATSON filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against LONG BEACH CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1712

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Maury Watson

Respondents and Defendants

Long Beach Civil Service Commission

City of Long Beach

Patrick H. West

Diko Melkonian

Respondents and Interested Parties

City of Long Beach

Patrick H. West

Diko Melkonian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert William Lucas

Attorney at ROBERT LUCAS LAW

101 Parkshore Drive, Suite 100

Folsom, CA 95630-4726

Wendell Brooks Phillips

Attorney at Phillips & Rickards

33173 Mulholland Hwy

Malibu, CA 90265-2434

Respondent, Defendant and Interested Party Attorneys

John Charles Parkin

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

411 W. Ocean Boulevard,, 9Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4664

Gary Jemal Anderson

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

333 W Ocean Boulevard, 11Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802-4664

Monica Jane Kilaita

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

411 W Ocean Bouevard, Floor 9

Long Beach, CA 90802-4511

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record electronically imported.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Maury Watson Attorney: Robert William Lucas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B307558; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCP00126

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF LONG BEACH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kilaita, Monica