This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 12/23/2022 at 07:00:35 (UTC).

WATER AUDIT CALIFORNIA v. NEVADA IRRIGATION DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 WATER AUDIT CALIFORNIA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against NEVADA IRRIGATION DISTRICT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5144

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Water Audit California

Respondent and Defendant

Nevada Irrigation District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

William McKinnon

Attorney at Attorney at Law

952 School Street, No. 316

Napa, CA 94559

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Andrew John McClure

Attorney at Minasian Meith Soares Sexton & Cooper

P.O. Box 1679

Oroville, CA 95965-4803

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one file jacket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Water Audit California Attorney: William McKinnon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C092877; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Placer County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0044119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Water Audit California is a litigant