This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/27/2022 at 07:24:51 (UTC).

WARREN PUMPS v. S.C. (ANTONIOU)

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 WARREN PUMPS filed an Other lawsuit against C ANTONIOU. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9694

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Warren Pumps, LLC

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Anthansios Antoniou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Andrew S. Russell

Attorney at Pierce Davis & Perritano LLP

1330 Van Beurden Avenue Suite 103

Los Osos, CA 93402

James G. Scadden

Attorney at Gordon & Rees

1111 Broadway Ste 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Don Willenburg

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

1111 Broadway Suite 1700

Oakland, CA 94607

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Scott L Frost

Attorney at Frost Law Firm, PC

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Andrew Seitz

Attorney at Frost Law Firm

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Paul C. Cook

Attorney at Frost Law Firm

273 West 7Th Street

San Pedro, CA 90731

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Petitioner: Warren Pumps, LLC Attorney: Andrew S. Russell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Anthansios Antoniou Attorney: Paul C. Cook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Warren Pumps, LLC Attorney: Andrew S. Russell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B312809; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV27866

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where WARREN PUMPS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOK PAUL C.