This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/21/2021 at 21:23:07 (UTC).

Wardwell v. Vertical Infill, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Wardwell filed an Other lawsuit against Vertical Infill, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Pollack, Gregory and Trapp, Randa. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7908

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Pollack, Gregory

Trapp, Randa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

Kimberly Swierenga

San Diego, CA 92101-3714

Deborah M. Wardwell

Respondents and Defendants

Preferred Group Properties, Inc.

Vertical Infill, Inc.

Simis Law Group

Micole Elliot Simis

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Dean Lloyd Welsh

Burns Law Firm

Venus Burns

Brian Burns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Kimberly Marie Swierenga

Attorney at Swierenga Law & Mediation

110 W A St Ste 1075

San Diego, CA 92101-3714

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Micole Elliot Simis

Attorney at Simis Law Group

27372 Aliso Creek Rd Ste 230

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

Isaac Raymond Zfaty

Attorney at Zfaty Burns

660 Newport Center Dr., Ste. 470

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Kaeleen Emiko Korenaga

Attorney at Much Shelist, P. C.

660 Newport Center Dr Ste 900

Newport Beach, CA 92660-6440

James A. D'Ambrosio

Attorney at Stark & D'Ambrosio, LLP

501 W. Broadway, Suite 960

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED. Due on 02/26/2021 By 32 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: Clerk's rule 8.124 and Reporter'sRT-7/909pgs.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Partial As to appeal filed 9/10/20 (8/21 Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: The matter having been considered by Presiding Justice McConnell and Associate Justices Irion and Guerrero, the appeal filed by appellants Deborah M. Wardwell and her counsel, Kimberly Swierenga, on September 10, 2020, is DISMISSED IN PART to the extent it purports to appeal an order dated August 21, 2020, issued by the San Diego County Superior Court. In that notice of appeal, appellants states that they appeal a judgment or order dated August 28, 2020, and attach a copy of a judgment entered on August 28, 2020. Although the notice of appeal describes the judgment or order being appealed as an order after judgment (Code Civ. Proc., 904.1, subd. (a)(2)) and an order or judgment under Code of Civil Procedure section 904.1, subdivision (a)(3) through (13), the notice of appeal does not identify or attach any specific judgment or order that falls within any of those descriptions. The civil case information statement (CCIS) filed by appellants on November 6, 2020, again states that they appeal a judgment or order dated August 28, 2020. However, as with their notice of appeal, their CCIS describes the judgment or order being appealed as an order after judgment (Code Civ. Proc., 904.1, subd. (a)(2)) and an order or judgment under Code of Civil Procedure section 904.1, subdivision (a)(3) through (13). Appellants attached to their CCIS the following documents: (1) a minute order issued on August 21, 2020, in which the court, inter alia, (a) granted the motion for sanctions filed by respondent Preferred Group Properties, Inc. and imposed sanctions in the amount of $8,690 against appellants, and (b) granted the motion for sanctions filed by respondents Brian Burns, Venus Burns, and Burns Law Firm and imposed sanctions in the amount of $8,250 against appellants; and (2) a notice of entry of judgment served by respondent Preferred Group Properties, Inc., which included a copy of the judgment entered on August 28, 2020, dismissing appellant Wardwell's action against respondent Preferred Group Properties, Inc. This court has not received a notice of appeal challenging the August 21, 2020 order. The filing of a notice of appeal in the superior court is the exclusive means of taking an appeal from a superior court judgment or order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(a)(1).) California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(a)(2) provides: "The notice of appeal must be liberally construed. The notice of appeal is sufficient if it identifies the particular judgment or order being appealed." Furthermore, an appealable order must be "expressly specified" in a notice of appeal in order to be reviewable on appeal. (Colony Hill v. Ghamaty (2006) 143 Cal.App.4th 1156, 1171.) A notice of appeal, liberally construed, is nevertheless insufficient if it is not "reasonably clear" what the appellant was trying to appeal from. (In re Joshua S. (2007) 41 Cal.4th 261, 272.) In this case, the notice of appeal filed by appellants on September 10, 2020, did not expressly specify or identify the particular order (i.e., the August 21, 2020 order) purportedly being appealed, nor was it reasonably clear from the notice of appeal that appellants were trying to appeal from the August 21, 2020 order. Accordingly, the court lacks jurisdiction to consider appellants' purported appeal of the August 21, 2020 order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(a)(1), (a)(2); Colony Hill v. Ghamaty, supra, 143 Cal.App.4th at p. 1171; In re Joshua S., supra, 41 Cal.4th at p. 272.) The appeal may nevertheless proceed as to appellant Wardwell's appeal of the August 28, 2020 judgment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Respondent Burns et al re appealability per court's request dated 11/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellant re appealability per court's request dated 11/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: The first notice of appeal (NOA#1) filed by appellant Deborah M. Wardwell on August 14, 2020, appeals a judgment entered on March 11, 2020, dismissing appellant's action against defendants Vertical Infill, Inc., Micole Elliot Simis, Simis Law Group, and Dean Lloyd Welsh. The second notice of appeal (NOA#2) filed by appellants Deborah M. Wardwell and her counsel, Kimberly Swierenga, on September 10, 2020, states that they appeal a judgment or order dated August 28, 2020, and it attaches a copy of a judgment entered on August 28, 2020, dismissing appellant Wardwell's action against defendant Preferred Group Properties, Inc., doing business as Harcourts Prime Properties. However, NOA#2 describes the judgment or order being appealed as an order after judgment (Code Civ. Proc., 904.1, subd. (a)(2)) and an order or judgment under Code of Civil Procedure section 904.1, subdivision (a)(3) through (13). NOA#2 does not identify or attach any specific judgment or order that falls within any of those descriptions. The civil case information statement (CCIS) filed by appellants Wardwell and Swierenga on November 6, 2020, with respect to NOA#2 again states that they appeal a judgment or order dated August 28, 2020. The CCIS also states that a notice of entry of judgment or a copy of the judgment was served on September 28, 2020, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.104. However, as with NOA#2, the CCIS describes the judgment or order being appealed as an order after judgment (Code Civ. Proc., 904.1, subd. (a)(2)) and an order or judgment under Code of Civil Procedure section 904.1, subdivision (a)(3) through (13). Appellants attached to the CCIS the following documents: (1) a minute order issued on August 21, 2020, in which the court, inter alia, (a) granted the motion for sanctions filed by defendant Preferred Group Properties, Inc. and imposed sanctions in the amount of $8,690 against appellants, and (b) granted the motion for sanctions filed by defendants Brian Burns, Venus Burns, and Burns Law Firm and imposed sanctions in the amount of $8,250 against appellants; and (2) a notice of entry of judgment served by defendant Preferred Group Properties, Inc., which included a copy of the judgment entered on August 28, 2020, dismissing appellant Wardwell's action against defendant Preferred Group Properties, Inc. This court has not received a notice of appeal challenging the August 21, 2020 order. The filing of a notice of appeal in the superior court is the exclusive means of taking an appeal from a superior court judgment or order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(a)(1).) The court requests that appellants submit, within 10 days of the date of this letter, a letter: (1) clarifying whether their intent was to appeal the August 28, 2020 judgment and/or the August 21, 2020 order; and (2) if they intended to appeal the August 21, 2020 order, explaining why we should not dismiss their appeal as to that order for failure to file a notice of appeal challenging that order on or before October 25, 2020 (i.e., 60 days after a notice of entry of that order was served on August 25, 2020, pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.104(a)(1)(B)). (See San Diego County Superior Court's Register of Actions #428.) Defendants Preferred Group Properties, Inc., Brian Burns, Venus Burns, and Burns Law Firm may also address these issues by letter within the same 10-day time period.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.; Notes: 11/5/20

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 9/10/20 by Deborah M. Wardwell and Kimberly Swierenga

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Notice of proceedings not reported

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 9/10/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 8/26/20 - no POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 8/24/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 8/14/20 by Deborah M. Wardwell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019000003035-CU-NP-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Trapp, Randa

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vertical Infill, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer D'Ambrosio, James A