This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/11/2021 at 22:01:38 (UTC).

WARD v. S.C. (BINGHAM)

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 WARD filed an Other lawsuit against C BINGHAM. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9869

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mark Ward

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Reaver Bingham

Sharon Harada

Elizabeth Garcia

County of Los Angeles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Emmanuel Chukwuemek Akudinobi

Attorney at Akudinobi & Ikonte

3435 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1520

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Interested Party Attorneys

Melinda Lee Cantrall

Attorney at Hurrell Cantrall LLP

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Thomas C. Hurrell

Attorney at Hurrell Cantrall, LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Administrative Transfer to CA 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transferred to CA 2; Notes: The above-entitled matter is transferred to the Court of Appeal, Second Appellate District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Reaver Bingham Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Real Party in Interest: Sharon Harada Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Real Party in Interest: Elizabeth Garcia Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall Real Party in Interest: County of Los Angeles Attorney: Melinda Lee Cantrall

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of mandate/prohibition with request for stay filed; Notes: Petitioner: Mark Ward Attorney: Emmanuel Chukwuemek Akudinobi Trial setting conference, 7/23/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Hearing on Motion for Termination of Sanctions, 7/23/2021 at 8:30 a.m. Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, 8/27/2021 at 8:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melinda Lee Cantrall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURRELL, THOMAS C