This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/02/2022 at 14:01:35 (UTC).

Wang et al. v. Superior Court for the County of Napa

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Wang filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Napa. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wood, Victoria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4392

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wood, Victoria

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Francis Wang

Laura Young

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Napa

Interested Parties

Martha Kongsgaard

John Kongsgaard

Mary Kongsgaard

Albert Czap

Peter Goldman

Peter "Brian" Peletta

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Raymond A. Cardozo

Attorney at Reed Smith

101 Second Street - Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jason M. Skaggs

Attorney at Skaggs Faucette LLP

530 Lytton Avenue - 2Nd Floor

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Interested Party Attorneys

Timothy M. Flaherty

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Melissa Marie Palozola

Attorney at Clark Hill, LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

David M. Perl

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

505 Montgomery Street, 13Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert C. Holtzapple

Attorney at Epstein + Holtzapple LLP

369-B Third Street # 182

San Rafael, CA 94901

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The request for stay and petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate writ is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The request for stay and petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate writ is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Supplemental Appendix for Petition for Writ of Mandate, Volume 1 of 1, Pages 1-392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: to Preliminary Opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RPI Martha Kongsgaard's Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: responsive filing fee paid for prelim. oppo via TrueFiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 1; Pages 1 - 949

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief Non-Urgent Stay Requested Before February 28, 2022 Trial Date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Napa County Superior Court - Main; County: Napa; Trial Court Case Number: 19CV000286; Trial Court Judge: Wood, Victoria

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of San Mateo is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Marie Palozola

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOLTZAPPLE, ROBERT CHARLES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERL DAVID M.