This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/26/2022 at 23:16:06 (UTC).

Walmart Inc. v. County of Placer

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Walmart Inc filed an Other lawsuit against County of Placer. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3835

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jones, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Walmart Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

County of Placer

Amicus Curiae

California Retailers Associaion

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Colin W Fraser

18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92612

C. Stephen Davis

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92612

Colin W. Fraser

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

18565 Jamboree Road, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92612

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Gregory S. Warner

Attorney at Placer County Counsel's Office

175 Fulweiler Avenue

Auburn, CA 95603

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Andrew William Bodeau

Attorney at Ajalat, Polley, Ayoob & Matarese

500 N Brand Blvd, Suite 1870

Glendale, CA 91203-3489

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Walmart Inc. Attorney: Colin W. Fraser By appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: County of Placer Attorney: Gregory S. Warner By respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Walmart Inc.Attorney: Colin W. Fraser; Notes: By appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketBrief: Response to amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: County of PlacerAttorney: Gregory S. Warner; Notes: By respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: Amicus curiae for appellant: California Retailers Associaion Attorney: Andrew William Bodeau California Retailers Associaion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: California Retailers Association application to file an amicus curiae brief in support of appellant is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to file the brief as of the date of this order. The right to appear as an amicus curiae does not include the right to participate at oral argument. The response, if any, is to be served and filed by January 21, 2022. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Amicus curiae brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Amicus curiae for appellant: California Retailers AssociaionAttorney: Andrew William Bodeau; Notes: California Retailers Associaion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file amicus curiae brief filed by:; Notes: California Retailers Associaion for Leave to file Amicus Curiae Brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Walmart Inc. Attorney: Colin W. Fraser

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Appeal not selected for mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case ordered not eligible for mediation.; Notes: MAURO, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's mediation statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant's paid. Receipt#: R324830.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re CAMS.; Notes: Due 10 days after appellant files.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter to counsel advising of due date of Civil Case Information Statement.; Notes: CCIS and CAMS due: 04/19/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed in the trial court 03/19/21. Statutory Refund Action.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Placer County Superior Court - Main; County: Placer; Trial Court Case Number: SCV0044625; Trial Court Judge: Jones, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Retailers Association is a litigant

Latest cases where County of Placer is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BODEAU ANDREW