This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/27/2021 at 03:19:59 (UTC).

WALKOWIAK v. S.C. (OLSON)

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 WALKOWIAK filed an Other lawsuit against C OLSON. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7778

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

John Walkowiak

Anaheim, CA 92803

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Curtis R. Olson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mitchell Keiter

Attorney at Keiter Appellate Law

424 South Beverly Drive

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Eric Michael Kennedy

Attorney at Buchalter, A Professional Corporation

1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The request for judicial notice is granted. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for judicial notice filed; Notes: Petitioner: John Walkowiak Attorney: Mitchell Keiter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Substitution of attorney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: John Walkowiak Attorney: Mitchell Keiter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Received timely petition for review submitted by the counsel for petitioner. counsel is not showing in the court of appeal docket. emailed the counsel and ask to file a substitution of attorney in the Court of Appeal and send this court a copy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B310572; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV46503

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell Keiter