This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/13/2023 at 17:09:19 (UTC).

Walker v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Walker filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fleming, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7057

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fleming, Eric

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jeffrey Walker

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Office of the District Attorney

350 Rhode Island Street North Building, Suite 400N

San Francisco, CA 94103

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • HearingDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: copy of any written order denying his section 170.6 challenge and a copy of the transcript of the hearing where the trial court denied his section 170.6 challenge, by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: THE COURT: On January 27, 2023, petitioner filed a petition for writ of mandate challenging the denial of his Code of Civil Procedure section 170.6 challenge against the Honorable Eric Fleming. The petition does not contain an adequate record because petitioner has not included a written order denying his section 170.6 challenge, or a copy of the transcript from the hearing where the trial court denied his challenge. Accordingly, on or before February 27, 2023, petitioner shall file with this court a copy of any written order denying his section 170.6 challenge and a copy of the transcript of the hearing where the trial court denied his section 170.6 challenge.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: MandateRequest for Stay of P.C.H. Setting March 27, 2023Re Order Denying Peremptory Challenge 170.6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: 2219428; Trial Court Judge: Fleming, Eric; Trial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: 195989; Trial Court Judge: Fleming, Eric

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less